Agency number |
CA 5983 |
Title |
Department of Administrative Services [III], Central Office |
Date range |
24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 |
Series recorded by this agency |
Series |
Organisation controlling |
|
Location |
Australian Capital Territory |
Agency status |
Department of State |
Function |
24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 24 Jul 1987 - 30 Nov 1988 24 Jul 1987 - 30 Jun 1992 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993
|
Agency note |
The Department of Administrative Services [III], one of the new 'super ministries', was established on 24 July 1987 from elements of the following Departments abolished at the same time:
Department of Local Government and Administrative Services
(CA 4137)
Department of Resources and Energy (CA 3496)
Department of Sport Recreation and Tourism (CA 3498)
Department of Science [IIIl (CA 4136)
Department of Territories [II] (CA 4135)
Department of the Special Minister of State [II]
(CA 3497)
Department of Housing and Construction [111] (CA 3495)
Department of Arts, Heritage and Environment (CA 4131).
The Administrative Arrangement Orders of 24 July 1987 (published in Commonwealth of Australia Gazette, No S183, 24 July 1987) stated that the Department would have responsibility for the administration of the following legislation:
Archives Act 1983
Australian Protective Service Act 1987
Commonwealth Electoral Act 1918
Commonwealth Grants Commission Act 1973
Defence (Transitional Provisions) Act 1946 and Defence Transition
(Residual Provisions) Act 1952, insofar as they relate to National
Security (General) Regulations 54, 55AA, 55A, 60B, 60G and 60J to
60M
Flags Act 1953
Lands Acquisition Act 1955
Lands Acquisition (Defence) Act 1968
Lands Acquisition (Northern Territory Pastoral Leases) Act
1981 Members of Parliament (Staff) Act 1984
Meteorology Act 1955
Ministers of State Act 1952
Northern Territory (Commonwealth Lands) Act 1980
Northern Territory (Self-Government) Act 1978, sections 69 & 70
Parliament House Construction Authority Act 1979
Parliamentary Allowances Act 1952
Procurement of Goods, Works and Services Act
Public Accounts Committee Act 1951
Public Works Committee Act 1969
Referendum (Machinery Provisions) Act 1984
Representation Act 1983.
In the same Administrative Arrangement Order the Department was to be responsible for the following principal matters:
Acquisition, leasing, management and disposal of land and property
in Australia and overseas
Transport and storage services
Co-ordination of purchasing policy and civil Purchasing
Disposal of goods
Provision of accommodation and catering
Protective services at Commonwealth establishments
Analytical laboratory services
Meteorology
Ionospheric prediction
National Archives
Valuation services
Geodesy, mapping and surveying services
Planning, execution and maintenance of Commonwealth Government works
Design and maintenance of Government furniture, furnishings and
fittings
Information co-ordination and services within Australia, including
printing, publishing and advertising
Electoral matters
Australian honours and symbols policy
Provision of facilities for members of Parliament other than in
Parliament House
Administrative support for Royal Commissions and certain Committees
of Inquiry.
The new Department gained the transport and storage, land and property services, purchasing and disposals, accommodation and catering, valuation services and protective services functions from the abolished Department of Local Government and Administrative Services. The responsibility for Australian Archives came from the defunct Department of Arts, Heritage and Environment. It gained the
meteorology and ionospheric prediction functions from the Department of Science [II]. From the Department of Territories [II] it gained the responsibility for the Parliament House Construction Authority and from the Department of Sport, Recreation and Tourism the functions of information co-ordination and services. From the defunct Department of Resources and Energy it gained geodesy and mapping. The Department of Housing and Construction [III]'s architecture, engineering, civil programmes and operations functions were transferred to the new Department.
Initially, the Central Office of the Department of Administrative Services was organised into the following groups:
Australian Property Group
Overseas Property Group
Transport and Storage Group
Purchasing and Sales Group
Parliamentary Services and Information Group
Business Development Group
Construction Group
Surveying and Land Information Group.
In addition it was responsible for the following services:
Corporate Services
ADP Services
Australian Protective Service.
On 6 February 1989 responsibility for information co-ordination and services within Australia, including advertising (but not printing and publishing), passed from Administrative Services to the Department of the Arts, Sport, the Environment, Tourism and Territories; and on 27 June 1990 the function of meterology was also transferred to that Department.
On 19 February 1990 a reorganisation of the Department took effect. The functions were divided into 4 programs:
Property Services Program
Australian Property Group
Australian Construction Services
Australian Survey and Land Information Group
Australian Valuation Office
Sales and Services Program
Australian Government Publishing Service
Transport and Storage Group
Purchasing and Sales Group
Australian Protective Service
Purchasing Reform Group
Australian Government Analytical Laboratories
Government and Corporate Services Program
Corporate Centre
Corporate Servicing
Overseas Property Group
Parliamentary and Ministerial Services Group
Ionospheric Prediction Service
Australian Archives
Bureau of Meteorology
Monitoring and Prediction
Scientific Development
Meteorology and Hydrology Services
International Activities.
In February 1990 the following information was released about the structure of the executive management of DAS:
The DAS Board of Management is the Secretary's chief advisory body and generally meets monthly. It deals with the strategic and critical tactical issues facing the Department and its constituent programs. It focuses on the financial and business activities of the Department. The Board is chaired by the Secretary and has four other Executive Members. External Members include a client representative, a private sector representative and two union representatives. The Department's Financial Controller attends meetings in an advisory capacity. The Board has a secretariat which provides full support services.
Whereas the Board is the Secretary's chief strategic advisory body, the DAS Executive Committee (EXCOM) is the Department's top management decision making body. EXCOM consists of the Secretary as Chairman, the three EGMs, and the Director of the Bureau of Meteorology. Meeting weekly, it determines the Department's short term priorities, particularly in relation to the Department's responsibilities to the Minister and Parliament. It also makes key decisions on the general management of the Department in those areas which are not of a strategic nature requiring the Board of Management's consideration.
Other key corporate committees in DAS included the:
Audit Committee
Staff Development Committee
Information Technology Advisory Committee; and
DAS Staff Awards Committee.
The Administrative Arrangements Order of 27 June 1990 (published in Commonwealth of Australia Gazette, No S182, 3 July 1990) recorded the transfer of the Bureau of Meteorology (CA 1835) to the Department of Arts, Sport, the Environment, Tourism and Territories, Central Office (CA 5984).
In the Administrative Arrangements Order of 31 January 1992 (Commonwealth of Australia Gazette No S37, 5 February 1992) the Procurement of Goods, Works and Services Act 1981 was repealed by the Administrative Services Legislation Amendment Act 1990.
In the Administrative Arrangements Order of 30 June 1992 (Commonwealth of Australia Gazette, No GN27, 8 July 1992) the function of 'Protective services at Commonwealth establishments and diplomatic and consular premises in Australia' and the Australian Protective Service Act 1987 were taken from the Department of Administrative Services [III] (CA 5983) and became the responsibility of the Attorney-General's Department (CA 5).
During the latter part of 1992 the Department underwent extensive restructuring, particularly at the top level of management. As at 15 February 1993 the new structure was as follows:
The Secretary or Chief Executive Officer (N Tanzer) had the DAS Board as his chief strategic advisory body and this board consisted of the Secretary as Chairman, three representatives from the private sector, two union representatives, one client representative and three of the DAS Executive General Managers.
The DAS Executive Committee (EXCOM) was the Department's top management decision making body and consisted of the Secretary as Chairman with the four DAS Executive General Managers.
The activities of the Department are divided into four main areas, each under the control of an Executive General Manager. The four areas were:
Commercial
Business Development
Government
Corporate.
The Department of Administrative Services [III] was abolished on 24 March 1993 pursuant to the Administrative Arrangements Order of that date. All of its functions passed to the new Department of the Arts and Administrative Services (CA 7663).
Ministers of the Department were:
24 Jul 1987 - 3 Apr 1990 : Hon Stewart John West
4 Apr 1990 - 24 Mar 1993 : Senator the Hon Nick Bolkus
There was also initially a junior Minister, Senator Robert Francis Ray who was the Minister for Home Affairs. Senator Ray became the Minister for Immigration, Local Government and Ethnic Affairs and later became the Minister for Defence.
Secretaries of the Department were:
24 Jul 1987 - 1 Mar 1989 : G G Glenn
1 Mar 1989 - 24 Mar 1993 : N J TanzerHistorical agency address111 Alinga Street, CanberraLegislation administeredCreation: Commonwealth of Australia Gazette No. S 183, 24 July 1987
Abolition: Commonwealth of Australia Gazette No. S 91, 24 March 1993 |
Previous agency |
24 Jul 1987 CA 3495, Department of Housing and Construction [III], Central Office - Government works, furniture, furnishings and fittings 24 Jul 1987 CA 3496, Department of Resources and Energy, Central Office - for geodosy and mapping function 24 Jul 1987 CA 3497, Department of the Special Minister of State [II], Central Office - For honours and symbols policy, parliamentary facilities, support for Royal Commissions, the Electoral Act and the Grants Commission 24 Jul 1987 CA 3498, Department of Sport, Recreation and Tourism, Central Office - Information co-ordination and services 24 Jul 1987 CA 4131, Department of Arts, Heritage and Environment, Central Office - Responsibility for Australian Archives 24 Jul 1987 CA 4135, Department of Territories [II], Central Office - For the Parliament House Construction Authority 24 Jul 1987 CA 4136, Department of Science [III], Central Office - For meteorology, ionospheric prediction and analytical laboratory services 24 Jul 1987 CA 4137, Department of Local Government and Administrative Services, Central Office - Transport and storage, land and property services, purchasing and disposals, accommodation and catering, valuation and protective services and survey function 31 Aug 1990 CA 2871, Parliament House Construction Authority
|
Subsequent agency |
27 Jun 1990 CA 5984, Department of the Arts, Sport, the Environment, Tourism and Territories, Central Office - for the Meteorology function 01 Jul 1992 CA 5, Attorney-General's Department, Central Office - for the Protective services function 24 Mar 1993 CA 7663, Department of the Arts and Administrative Services, Central Office - for all functions
|
Controlled agency |
24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 1061, Australian Property Group, State Office, New South Wales 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 1720, Australian Archives, Central Office 24 Jul 1987 - 27 Jun 1990 CA 1835, Bureau of Meteorology, Head Office 24 Jul 1987 - 30 Aug 1990 CA 2871, Parliament House Construction Authority 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 3160, Commonwealth Fire Board [II] (from 1973-1975 Australian Fire Board) 24 Jul 1987 - 01 Feb 1991 CA 3184, Transport and Storage Group, South Australia 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 3854, Australian Electoral Commission, Central Office 24 Jul 1987 - 06 Feb 1989 CA 4102, Office of Government Information and Advertising, Sydney Office 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 4155, Purchasing Australia, Regional Office, Western Australia 24 Jul 1987 - 04 Mar 1991 CA 4168, Transport and Storage Division, Western Australia/ (from 1987) known as Transport and Storage Group, Western Australia 24 Jul 1987 - 01 Jul 1992 CA 4745, Australian Protective Service, Central Region, South Australia 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 5104, Commonwealth Government Bookshop, Adelaide [South Australia] 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 5856, Department of Administrative Services [III], Corporate Services Group, Queensland 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6114, Department of Administrative Services [III], Corporate Services Group, Regional Office, Western Australia 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6350, Department of Administrative Services [III], Corporate Services, Regional Office, New South Wales (also known as Management Services, Regional Office, New South Wales) 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6588, Department of Administrative Services [III], South Australia 24 Jul 1987 - 01 Jul 1990 CA 6591, Australian Construction Services [I], South Australia/Northern Territory Region 24 Jul 1987 - 21 Sep 1987 CA 6680, Property Directorate, Regional Office, Victoria 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6697, Australian Construction Services, Central Office 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6738, Department of Administrative Services [III], Northern Territory Region 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6762, Australian Surveying and Land Information Group [AUSLIG] 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6796, Department of Administrative Services [III], Corporate Services Group/(from July 1992) Support Services, Tasmania 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6828, Australian Property Group, South Australia 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6830, DAS Purchasing Services, Regional Office, South Australia 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6960, Australian Property Group, State Office, Queensland 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6964, Purchasing Australia, Regional Office, Queensland 24 Jul 1987 - 04 Mar 1991 CA 6987, Transport and Storage Group, Tasmania 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7001, Australian Property Group, Western Australia/ (by 1990) Australian Property, Western Australia 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7081, Competitive Tendering and Contracting Unit, Regional Office, Tasmania - Purchasing Office 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7089, Australian Valuation Office, Central Office 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6710, Department of Administrative Services [III], Regional Office, Victoria, Management Services Branch/(from 1987) Corporate Support Unit 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6716, Purchasing Australia, Regional Office, Victoria 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6719, Transport and Storage Group,Victorian Branch - Transport and Storage Group, Central Office, Canberra 24 Jul 1987 - CA 7415, Australian Property Group, State Office, Northern Territory 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 4474, Commonwealth Grants Commission [II] 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 3897, Bureau of Meteorology, IPS Radio and Space Services 24 Jul 1987 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 8148, Australian Government Analytical Laboratories, Central Laboratory 21 Sep 1987 - CA 6720, Australian Property Group, Victorian Branch 30 Jun 1989 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7362, Department of Administrative Services [III], Regional Coordinator's/ (from July 1994) Regional General Manager's Office, New South Wales 19 Feb 1990 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7386, State Manager, Department of Finance and Administration, Tasmania 13 Mar 1990 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7949, Department of Administrative Services [III], Regional Coordinator's Office, Northern Territory 01 Jul 1990 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7704, Australian Construction Services [II], State Office, South Australia 01 Feb 1991 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 8799, Removals Australia, National Office 01 Jul 1992 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7602, Australian Estate Management, North Queensland Regional Office, Townsville [Queensland] 01 Jul 1992 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 8157, Australian Estate Management, Regional Office, South Queensland 01 Jul 1992 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7817, Australian Estate Management/(from1996) Domestic Property Group, Regional Office, Western Australia 01 Jul 1992 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 7555, Australian Estate Management, Regional Office, South Australia 01 Jul 1992 - 24 Mar 1993 CA 6698, Australian Construction Services, Australian Capital Territory Regional Office
|
Persons associated with agency |
24 Jul 1987 - 03 Apr 1990 CP 386, Hon Stewart John WEST - Minister 24 Jul 1987 - 02 Sep 1988 CP 995, Senator the Hon Robert Francis RAY - Minister for Home Affairs 01 Mar 1989 - 24 Mar 1993 CP 691, Noel John TANZER AC - Secretary 04 Apr 1990 - 24 Mar 1993 CP 505, Hon Nick BOLKUS - Minister
|
Date registered |
16 Oct 1987 |
|